HUDDERSFIELD WOMEN'S AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kirklees
Governance
- 23 April 1981: Standard registration
- 14 February 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 February 2005: Funds transferred to 1094215 Pennine Domestic Abuse Partnership
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 21 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISTRESS AMONG WOMEN SHO HAVE BEEN MALTREATED BY THEIR HUSBANDS OR BY THE MAN WITH WHOM THEY ARE OR HAVE BEEN LIVING, AND AMONG THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN, BY THE PROVISION OF HOSTEL ACCOMODATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window