FRIENDS OF BENSON LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY ENGAGES IN FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES IN ORDER TO MAKE A FINANCIAL CONTRIBUTION TO THE CONTINUATION OF A LIBRARY SERVICE IN THE VILLAGE OF BENSON, OXFORDSHIRE, IN COOPERATION WITH OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY LIBRARY SERVICES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,488 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 January 2018: CIO registration
- 18 August 2018: Funds received from 1147897 FRIENDS OF BENSON LIBRARY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Mary Swann | Chair | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Harold Thorpe | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Lucy Mary Browne | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Emily Pignon | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richard Jack Swann | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY ANGELA PHILLIPSON | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MARGARET THOMSON-TUR | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
VIVIEN MARY GARDNER | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK FINBARR O'CONNOR MA BA FCIS | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREW MURPHY | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.43k | £3.84k | £2.86k | £8.18k | £8.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.03k | £5.52k | £1.45k | £10.87k | £4.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.60k | £746 | £533 | £4.49k | £4.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jan 2018 as amended on 24 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE USE OF A PUBLIC LENDING LIBRARY SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF BENSON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Benson Library
Castle Square
Benson
WALLINGFORD
Oxfordshire
OX10 6SD
- Phone:
- 01491824158
- Website:
-
friendsofbensonlibrary.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window