NOTTINGHAM UNIVERSITY SAMWORTH ACADEMIES ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1176509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 April 2019 On time Download