RADIO CLATTERBRIDGE

Charity number: 511365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.16k £4.35k £13.75k £9.21k £8.29k
Total expenditure £4.97k £5.38k £7.19k £9.88k £6.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A