TRUE JESUS CHURCH (ESSEX)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the gospel of Jesus Christ for the benefit of the public in accordance with the following doctrines: One True God, One True Church, Water Baptism, Receiving the Holy Spirit, Foot Washing, Holy Communion and the Sabbath.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 09 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Ho | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Choo | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Lai | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Shek | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
YOUYOU LU | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.12k | £242.39k | £66.05k | £97.31k | £71.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.69k | £4.35k | £787 | £7.89k | £9.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2022
(These accounts |
21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2021
(These accounts |
15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 APR 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING DOCTRINES: ONE TRUE GOD, ONE TRUE CHURCH, WATER BAPTISM, RECEIVING THE HOLY SPIRIT, FOOT WASHING, HOLY COMMUNION AND OBSERVANCE OF SABBATH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
True Jesus Church
151 Broomfield Road
CHELMSFORD
CM1 1RY
- Phone:
- 07443834309
- Email:
- essex@tjc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window