Trustees WORDSMITH AWARDS
Charity number: 1181088

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONAH EARLE | Chair | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nasima Begum | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Stuart | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELISABETH CORDINGLEY DR | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CROLL | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA LEE | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
GUY PERRY | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
TOLULOLA AGBELUSI | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.