THE CHILDREN'S AID COMMITTEE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1177803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 November 2019 26 days late Download