THE CHILDREN'S AID COMMITTEE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1177803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAWN REBECCA FRANGI FCA Trustee 15 September 2018 None on record
ABRAHAM DAVID LANDY Trustee 21 February 2001
NWL JEWISH DAY SCHOOL Received: On time
JONATHAN ASHLEY STEINBERG FCA Chair 03 February 2017 None on record
WARREN SPENCER STARR FCA Trustee 15 February 2013 None on record
HENRY MINKOFF Trustee 10 February 2003 None on record