Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CYPRIAN CLARENCE GATE
Charity number: 1176918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM JOHN PARRY MA MSTACA | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|||||
MRS CHAN MAYOR | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|||||
William James Nye LVO | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE FULLER | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALEXIA PRAKAS | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MS MARY ASHWIN | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH DANIELS | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT TREVOR GWYNNE | Trustee | 10 April 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.