BUBWITH LEISURE AND SPORTS CENTRE

Charity number: 1177049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 25 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 09 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 31 October 2019 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 31 October 2019 31 days late Download