Trustees BUBWITH LEISURE AND SPORTS CENTRE
Charity number: 1177049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaun Michael Thompson | Chair | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Craven | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Richards | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Hills | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stewart Dunlop | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Alan Johnston | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Suddaby | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Cunningham | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lizanne Southworth | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.