PETERBOROUGH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1176050
Charity reporting is up to date (123 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As Scouts, we believe in preparing young people with skills for life. Peterborough Scout District Council supports Network and Explorer Scout Units and Scout Groups across the Peterborough area to encourage the young people to do more, learn more and be more. Each week we support our members by providing the opportunity to enjoy fun and adventure while developing the skills they need to succeed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £79,656
Total expenditure: £82,880

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Peterborough City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 2017: Standard registration
  • 10 January 2019: Funds received from 1027467 NENE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
  • 22 December 2020: Funds received from 1031242 MEDEHAMSTEDE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PETERBOROUGH DISTRICT SCOUTS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Simon Parsons Chair 01 September 2017
None on record
Mark Crookes Trustee 16 October 2023
HELPSTON SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP
Received: On time
Adam Pallister Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Nina Doughty Colbert Trustee 02 October 2022
None on record
Daniel Leslie Smart Trustee 02 October 2022
None on record
Mark John Royle Trustee 02 October 2022
None on record
Thomas James Scott Law Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £60.06k £78.27k £50.19k £67.91k £79.66k
Total expenditure £60.97k £37.79k £60.36k £68.08k £82.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £36.29k £6.09k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 01 May 2025 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 01 May 2025 123 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 13 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 10 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 10 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 25 January 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 25 January 2022 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 08 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 WHITEWATER
ORTON WISTOW
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 6FB
Phone:
07785 942166
Website:

cambridgeshirescouts.org.uk