THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, ROPLEY, WINCHESTER

Charity number: 1176142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JULIA ROSEMARY FLORY Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
ANDREW BONNER Trustee 10 March 2019 None on record
KEITH EDWARD JOHN MONKHOUSE Trustee 10 March 2019 None on record
RODNEY CHARLES SKINNER Trustee 10 March 2019 None on record
KENNETH EDWARD INGLE Trustee 24 March 2017
THE JACOB AND MARY HAGEN MEMORIAL Overdue by 89 days
FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S CHURCH, ROPLEY Overdue by 89 days
RONALD CLIVE BEAL Trustee 10 March 2019 None on record
Nigel Richard Plowright Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
Rev CLARE WELHAM Chair 10 March 2019
WEST TISTED VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
ALISON JEAN WOOD Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
ROBERT HUMPHREY CARR Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
SUSAN MARGARET THOMAS Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
Jane Elizabeth Plowright Trustee 10 March 2019 None on record
ELIZABETH JOANNA WHEELER Trustee 23 May 2021
CHARITY OF THE REVEREND HENRY WALTER CABELL GELDART Received: On time
NORMA EVELYN DAY Trustee 24 March 2017
CHARITY OF THE REVEREND HENRY WALTER CABELL GELDART Received: On time