GROW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grow works with vulnerable and disadvantaged young people who face barriers when seeking employment. Our approach focuses on the soft skills that are a key ingredient to thriving at work, such as working well with others, handling conflict and managing personal motivation. Grow runs programmes that combine coaching with nature based activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £60,740 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN LOVELL | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
George Foster | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shari Mysorekar | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Prosser | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Pridmore | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Henderson - Reay | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Pickering | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.32k | £60.78k | £172.45k | £244.22k | £379.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.73k | £40.71k | £169.94k | £253.94k | £350.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.66k | £5.52k | £24.99k | £60.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 16-24 WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED, BY WAY OF BEING CARE LEAVERS AND/OR EX-OFFENDERS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SHEFFIELD, INCLUDING RUNNING PRE-EMPLOYMENT TRAINING PROGRAMMES AND SUPPORTING YOUNG PEOPLE IN FINDING AND RETAINING EMPLOYMENT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grow
389 Manor Lane
SHEFFIELD
S2 1UL
- Phone:
- 01143211810
- Email:
- admin@growuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window