Accounts and annual returns THE MARTIN JAMES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 27 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window