Accounts and annual returns SARASIN CHARITY AUTHORISED INVESTMENT FUNDS

Charity number: 1176240
Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 201 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 March 2021 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 March 2021 137 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 May 2020 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late Download Open in new window