Trustees HURST CONSOLIDATED CHARITY

Charity number: 1177503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philippa Wickenden Trustee 04 October 2017
None on record
William John Osborne Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record
GEOFFREY VERNON HARPER Trustee 09 July 2014
None on record
WAYNE SMITH Trustee 19 September 2011
None on record
ERIC JOHN EDWARDS Trustee 18 April 2002
None on record
RICHARD JAMES FORT Trustee
THE POLEHAMPTON CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HUGH PENNEY Trustee
None on record