Trustees ST ELIZABETH'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1176777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Ross Maguire Kemball Chair 21 March 2019
ST JOSEPH'S SOCIETY
Received: On time
Corina Sampson Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Adrian Philip Cullen Trustee 24 June 2024
None on record
Reverend Father Peter Howard Lyness Trustee 19 May 2020
None on record
Robert Moore Trustee 17 July 2018
None on record
Nicholas Seed Trustee 17 July 2018
None on record
BISHOP PAUL MCALEENAN Trustee 15 April 2018
SHARED CHURCHES (HERTFORDSHIRE AND BEDFORDSHIRE) LIMITED
Received: On time
CHARLES PLATER TRUST
Received: On time
John Coleby Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
SISTER VERONICA HAGEN Trustee 29 November 2017
THE CONGREGATION OF THE DAUGHTERS OF THE CROSS OF LIEGE
Received: On time
ST RAPHAEL'S HOSPICE
Received: On time
SISTER JOSEPHINE ANNE CLEMENCE Trustee 29 November 2017
THE CONGREGATION OF THE DAUGHTERS OF THE CROSS OF LIEGE
Received: On time
Sister PATRICIA ANN AINSWORTH Trustee 29 November 2017
None on record