Accounts and annual returns WARRINGTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 511469
Charity reporting is up to date (144 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 March 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 March 2022 144 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 March 2022 509 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 March 2022 509 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window