Financial history WARRINGTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 511469
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £88.69k £92.59k £93.71k £82.00k £21.59k
Total expenditure £103.88k £109.50k £101.31k £104.67k £25.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A