Trustees WANSBECK VALLEY FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1177303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Charles Anderson Chair 23 April 2018
None on record
David Roy Lea Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Richard Scholfield Trustee 13 March 2023
None on record
Mark E D Facey Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Rev John Rowley Trustee 28 February 2018
None on record