Accounts and annual returns MATA SAHIB KAUR EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1178173
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 March 2022 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 March 2022 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 March 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 March 2021 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window