Trustees MATA SAHIB KAUR EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1178173
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bhupinder Singh Trustee 18 July 2021
None on record
Amritpal Kaur Trustee 05 May 2020
None on record
TAJINDER KAUR Trustee 05 January 2020
None on record
Inderjit Kaur Punia Trustee 02 June 2019
None on record
Parminder Kaur Rai Trustee 02 June 2019
None on record
KULJIT SINGH BADWAL Trustee 13 March 2017
None on record
TARANJEET SINGH Trustee 13 March 2017
None on record