MO BRO SPORT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 July 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Netherlands
Governance
- 13 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Statham | Chair | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/07/2019 | 21/07/2020 | 21/07/2021 | 21/07/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days | |
Annual return | 21 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 367 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 367 days | |
Annual return | 21 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 July 2021 | 12 April 2023 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2021 | 12 April 2023 | 326 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 July 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 250 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 250 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1.TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING A VARIETY OF SPORTS CAPABLE OF PROMOTING HEALTHY RECREATION; AND 2. TO ADVANCE GOOD HEALTH BY EDUCATING ON THE BENEFITS OF PHYSICAL EXERCISE AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HEALTH ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO MENTAL HEALTH. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 COTLAND ACRES
REDHILL
RH1 6JZ
- Phone:
- 07951048018
- Email:
- MOBRORUGBY@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window