THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, ST HELIER

Charity number: 1176841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 December 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 December 2020 48 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 June 2019 On time Download