Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT MARSDEN ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST WITH NELSON ST PHILIP
Charity number: 1176541

Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LORELLI ALISON HILLIARD | Chair | 30 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE SHAW | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MUZZAFFAR RASHID | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE ASHWORTH | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE PRICE | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DESMOND MURPHY | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR SOHAIL | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|||||
HELEN ANITA SPENCER | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA MCLOUGHLIN | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN WRIGHT | Trustee | 30 April 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.