FRIENDS OF THE DROP-IN FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES

Charity number: 1176524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MALI SAHA Trustee 06 May 2020 None on record
Zeinab Cummings Trustee 04 January 2018 None on record
ZARA JUMA Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
FELICITY LIVSEY Trustee 04 January 2018 None on record
FANNIE HARA NG'AMBI Trustee 04 November 2020 None on record
Sally Vivyan Trustee 19 March 2021 None on record
JANE NIKOLARAKIS Trustee 11 April 2018 None on record
STEPHEN NEWMAN Chair 11 April 2018 None on record
ABRAHAM EHIAGHE EILUORIOR Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record