Accounts and annual returns STROKE AND DIABETES EDUCATION AND AID FOUNDATION (SADEAF)

Charity number: 1178260
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 31 May 2022 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 01 June 2022 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 January 2021 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 08 February 2021 284 days late Download Open in new window