Accounts and annual returns THE MATTHEW NICHOLLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1177164
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2022 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 07 October 2022 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2021 18 January 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 18 January 2022 21 days late
Annual return 29 February 2020 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 11 June 2020 On Time