AHAVA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help children and people in poverty in Sub-saharan African, as of now, East Africa, this includes Uganda. We provide skills to woman to help them out of poverty and prevent them from placing their children in orphanages. We also take part in fundraising events and selling products.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Uganda
Governance
- 09 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DERICK MUBIRU | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH MUTESI | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 10 December 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 10 December 2024 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 06 July 2024 | 248 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 10 December 2024 | 405 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 04 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 04 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 02 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 02 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN UGANDA AND LONDON BY PROVIDING: I) EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT II) BLANKETS AND FOOD TO THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR ROUGH SLEEPERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10C NEWNTON CLOSE
LONDON
N4 2RQ
- Phone:
- 07713338065
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window