PTFA PLYMPTON ST. MAURICE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1176728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 April 2021 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required