THE ACTORS' CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant, advice and support for the children of professional actors and their families, throughout the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 February 2018: CIO registration
- 09 June 2018: Funds received from 206809 THE ACTORS' CHILDREN'S TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Hill | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair Evans | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane-Luise Foy | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Humphrey | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Watson | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Dean | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Genevieve Allenbury | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Curtis | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Crankshaw | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Rintoul | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Myette Francis Whalley | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Buffy Davis | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09m | £437.20k | £221.93k | £308.17k | £217.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £981.42k | £1.40m | £1.20m | £950.92k | £608.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £860.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £226.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £819.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £942.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £39.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £35.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CIO'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 THE SUPPORT OF THE CHILDREN OF PROFESSIONAL ACTORS WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF ILLNESS, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. 3.1.2 SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 3.1.1, THE SUPPORT OF PROFESSIONAL ACTORS OR THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF AGE, ILLNESS, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Actors Childrens Trust
58 Bloomsbury Street
LONDON
WC1B 3QT
- Phone:
- 02076367868
- Email:
- robert@actorschildren.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window