Accounts and annual returns THE CHRIS BEVINGTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178385
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2021 03 April 2022 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 03 April 2022 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2020 29 December 2021 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 29 December 2021 303 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2019 12 May 2020 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 12 May 2020 72 days late Download Open in new window