THE ARK INTERNATIONAL
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Ark International provides services that support people in need, such as: vulnerable adults, young people, families, people with drug/alcohol addiction, mental health, and modern-day slavery. The head office is in Bolton, and we also have another base in London, Uxbridge.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2021
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £4,500 o 2 grant(iau) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Llety/tai
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Lloegr
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 01/04/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £39.97k | £18.00k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £39.28k | £13.00k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £37.35k | £4.50k |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 31 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 31 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 31 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Apr 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GREATER MANCHESTER WITH THE FOCUS ON THE AREAS WITHIN BOLTON AND SALFORD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. TO EXPRESS THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF CHRISTIAN FAITH MEETINGS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN FESTIVALS PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window