LIBERTY HOUSE SW

Charity number: 1180498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 22 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 June 2020 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 637 days