Trustees CROWLE PEATLAND RAILWAY

Charity number: 1180684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Michael Ward Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Peter Enefer Trustee 22 May 2021
None on record
John Anthony Tavender Trustee 10 June 2020
YORK AND DISTRICT GUILD OF WEAVERS, SPINNERS AND DYERS
Received: On time
William Coleman Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record
Neil Trevor Waller Trustee 22 August 2019
None on record
ANGUS TOWNLEY Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
JULIE DEBORAH REED Trustee 14 November 2018
THE NEW GENERATION RECREATION ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CROWLE COMMUNITY HALL OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE CROWLE VILLAGE HALL
Overdue by 27 days
DISABILITY ADVOCACY IN SUPPORTING YOUNGSTERS
Overdue by 27 days
CROWLE AND EALAND PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time