Accounts and annual returns THE XANDA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 November 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 November 2019 19 days late Download Open in new window