Accounts and annual returns THE RIVER WEY TRUST

Charity number: 1177871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 12 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 02 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window