COVENTRY SOUTH DIVISION GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing recreation, education and training for children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Coventry City
Governance
- 21 July 1981: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 June 2016: Re-registered
- COVENTRY SOUTH DIVISION GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Pennington | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Jean May Manning | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Burgham | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Ree | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Hartles-Spencer | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
TINA WALKER | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
MRS ENID LACEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.51k | £32.07k | £2.93k | £24.87k | £23.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.14k | £16.84k | £493 | £17.32k | £22.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 Grosvenor Road
Coventry
CV1 3FZ
- Phone:
- 02476230554
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window