BICTON HEATH HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £11.92k £12.70k £12.00k £11.79k £11.65k
Total expenditure £14.44k £11.77k £8.38k £6.49k £6.62k
Income from government contracts £1.97k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A