THE JARMAN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply funds for the benefit of charities or such charitable purposes as the trustees may determine from time to time. The Trust makes grants to a range of charities and charitable activities in accordance with the Trust's grant making policies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN EDWARD JARMAN | Chair | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HARRIETTE INDIA LOUISE JARMAN | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA SUSAN JARMAN | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE VIRGINIA JARMAN | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
OLIVIA KATE JARMAN | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £626.52k | £14.50k | £7.76k | £7.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.50k | £19.21k | £10.41k | £14.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £625.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £25.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 223 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 223 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 589 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 589 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 19 December 2022 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 October 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 17 March 2021 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH A TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH A MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 PRATTS BUILDINGS
KING STREET
WINTERTON-ON-SEA
GREAT YARMOUTH
NR29 4AU
- Phone:
- 07931169618
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window