THE SPARKHILL TRUST

Charity number: 511666
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 November 2016 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)