TRINITY CENTRAL LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation operates a church in the London area, providing a place of Worship and teaching related to the Christian Faith with the aim of the advancement of the Faith as well as the building of a Christian community. This community will seek to provide pastoral support to it's members and the local community, with the aim of the relief of poverty, hardship and loneliness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- India
- Netherlands
- Philippines
- South Africa
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 20 July 2018: CIO registration
- TRINITY CHURCH LONDON (Working name)
- THE TRINITY CHURCH LONDON (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yinglen Jackie Butt | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Reece Okotan | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bull | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL MACLEOD | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338.18k | £243.65k | £209.75k | £247.96k | £241.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £265.37k | £223.33k | £207.73k | £268.14k | £260.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
237 LILLIE ROAD
LONDON
SW6 7LN
- Phone:
- 07739604295
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window