Trustees West Yorkshire Hardship Project

Charity number: 1179305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Derek Hallas Chair 24 July 2018
None on record
Sonia Riaz Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Adam Wood Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Karen Elizabeth Redfearn Trustee 07 February 2021
None on record
Jill Garner Trustee 07 February 2021
None on record
Sarah Ahmed Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
Lee Glennan Trustee 11 January 2020
None on record
Hamzah Ibne Choudhry Trustee 20 January 2019
None on record