HEART OF GLASS ST HELENS LIMITED

Charity number: 1179366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jesse Jones Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record
DOREEN MARCIA FOSTER Trustee 20 September 2017 None on record
HANNAH LUCY FIRTH Trustee 08 June 2016 None on record
SUSAN MARGARET STUBBS Trustee 08 June 2016 None on record
PAUL PADRAIG HOGAN Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record
Julia Elizabeth Carruthers Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record
JOHN PREM FRANCIS WHALING Trustee 28 April 2017 None on record
SUSAN ANN GRINDROD Trustee 28 April 2017 None on record
JOANNA ROWLANDS Chair 06 October 2015 None on record
GORDON JOHN PENNINGTON Trustee 06 October 2015 None on record
JEAN CIARA TORMEY Trustee 08 June 2016 None on record
TOM ROWLANDS Trustee 22 April 2016 None on record