GET ME OUT THE FOUR WALLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Get Me Out The Four Walls offers peer support and informal social meets for parents/carers, living in Norfolk to overcome social isolation. Our social meets are organised by our team of volunteer Ambassadors. We offer support through information, advice, and guidance. We utilise the local network of voluntary sector and professional organisations to signpost towards additional support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,092 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 12 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Rose Mason | Chair | 31 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Joanne Hodgekins Mills | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Webber | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.31k | £38.82k | £56.13k | £56.46k | £62.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.84k | £35.72k | £38.06k | £63.46k | £54.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.03k | N/A | £0 | £2.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Mar 2018 as amended on 06 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
To provide relief to parents and carers affected by social isolation, by means of peer support, advice, and the provision of social activities. To advance the awareness and education of the public in matters relating to mental health conditions, specifically during the Perinatal period, and mental wellbeing. To advance the health and education of parents and carers by providing information, advice and guidance about parenting and other support available.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEXTY & CO
124 THORPE ROAD
NORWICH
NR1 1RS
- Phone:
- 01603335983
- Email:
- INFO@GETMEOUT.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window