HESWALL DISABLED CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY FUND

Charity number: 1177670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 28 August 2020 29 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 02 August 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 02 August 2019 3 days late Download