HESWALL DISABLED CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY FUND

Charity number: 1177670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAHAM BALDOCK Trustee 21 August 1989 None on record
CHARLIE BOUGH Trustee 17 August 2013 None on record
Bernard Christopher Larkin Trustee 19 September 2019 None on record
TOBY MADDOCKS Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
James Phillpotts Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
GRANT WRAY Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
Andrew Powell Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record