THE WOODHAMS STONE COLLECTION

Charity number: 1177312
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LARRAINE WILLIAMS Trustee 26 March 2017 None on record
JILL ELIZABETH WILSON Chair 26 March 2017
MALTON MUSEUM CIO Received: On time
DINAH ELIZABETH KEAL Trustee 01 June 2011
MALTON, NORTON AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB Received: On time
FREDERICK ABBOTT FOR THE PLEASURE GROUND Received: On time
DERWENT RIVERSIDE PROJECT Received: On time
RYEDALE COMMUNITY AND LEISURE CENTRE Received: On time
Nicholas John Hatton Trustee 07 February 2019 None on record
Mandy Jayne Enticknap Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
John Howard Blanchard Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
Stephen Croft Trustee 12 July 2018 None on record
Thomas Howard Campion Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
Linda McCarthy Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
Sarah Katherine Maultby Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record