THE MERCY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mercy Project undertakes activities to support vulnerable, lonely people and young people within the area of Newcastle-upon-Tyne city centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 21 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH ANNE CORLESS | Chair | 15 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amber Whittlesey-Hall | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Iqbal | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gerard Michael O'Brien | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin James Higgins | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.71k | £35.36k | £23.93k | £17.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.32k | £3.17k | £38.35k | £29.94k | £22.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 May 2018 as amended on 06 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN THE AREA OF Northumberland and Tyne & Wear IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF CARE, SUPPORT, ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING TO OTHER SOURCES OF ASSISTANCE. TO BE CARRIED OUT IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND AS A DEMONSTRATION OF CHRISTIAN COMPASSION AND MERCY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/0 THE DEAF CENTRE
2 SUMMERHILL GROVE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 6EE
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- mercy@mercyproject.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window